+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
666312 - Amendment
Between lines 67 and 68 insert:
534278 - Amendment
Between lines 67 and 68 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 1003.576 - Individual education plans for exceptional students.
- 1005.22 - Powers and duties of commission.
- 1012.796 - Complaints against teachers and administrators; procedure; penalties.
- 1013.385 -
- 1013.40 - Planning and construction of Florida College System institution facilities; property acquisition.
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 1262 Filed
- Yeas: 11
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 1262 Filed
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 1262 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor