+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-170
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) adopted (829124)
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
373630 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 2/1/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
331236 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (373630) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/1/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
829124 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Adopted 3/2/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 775.15 - Time limitations; general time limitations; exceptions.
+ − Votes (5)
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 1244 Filed
- Yeas: 7
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 1244 c1
- Yeas: 8
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 1244 c1
- Yeas: 17
March 8, 2022: Floor vote: S 1244 e1
- Yeas: 117
March 2, 2022: Floor vote: S 1244 c1
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor