+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
914852 - Amendment
Delete line 49 and insert:
+ − Sponsors (4)
Health Policy
Type:
Primary Sponsor