+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Policy (630784); YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
568886 - Amendment to Amendment (730402)
Between lines 115 and 116 insert:
630784 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
582424 - Amendment
Between lines 106 and 107 insert:
730402 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1230 Filed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor