+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1133 (Ch. 2015-180)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1133
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
268360 - Amendment
Delete lines 581 - 653.
491438 - Amendment
Between lines 542 and 543 insert:
350260 - Amendment
Delete lines 682 - 700 and insert:
829050 - Amendment
Delete lines 433 - 520 and insert:
361716 - Amendment
Delete lines 139 - 169 and insert:
719306 - Amendment
Delete lines 525 - 554.
853126 - Amendment
Delete lines 725 - 755.
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
- 626.015 - Definitions.
- 626.0428 - Agency personnel powers, duties, and limitations.
- 626.221 - Examination requirement; exemptions.
- 626.241 - Scope of examination.
- 626.2817 - Regulation of course providers, instructors, school officials, and monitor groups involved in prelicensure education for insurance agents and other licensees.
- 626.311 - Scope of license.
- 626.732 - Requirement as to knowledge, experience, or instruction.
- 626.7351 - Qualifications for customer representative’s license.
- 626.748 - Agent’s records.
- 626.7851 - Requirement as to knowledge, experience, or instruction.
- 626.8311 - Requirement as to knowledge, experience, or instruction.
- 626.8661 -
- 626.9541 - Unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices defined.
- 627.4553 - Recommendations to surrender.
- 631.341 - Notice of insolvency to policyholders by insurer, general agent, or agent.
- 648.355 - Temporary limited license as limited surety agent or professional bail bond agent; pending examination.
- 648.386 - Qualifications for prelicensing and continuing education schools and instructors.
- 626.7354 - Customer representative’s powers; agent’s or agency’s responsibility.
- 626.753 - Sharing commissions; penalty.
- 626.931 - Agent affidavit and insurer reporting requirements.
- 626.932 - Surplus lines tax.
- 626.935 - Suspension, revocation, or refusal of surplus lines agent’s license.
- 626.936 - Failure to file reports or pay tax or service fee; administrative penalty.
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 1222 Filed
- Yeas: 9
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 1222 c1
- Yeas: 6
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 1222 c1
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor