+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/16/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendment
886940 - Amendment
Delete lines 52 - 155 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1216 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1216 c1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor