+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
211666 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 1206 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor