+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 6519 (Ch. 2017-60)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 6519
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/19/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
- Now in Judiciary
- Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 12 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor