+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/17/21, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
577460 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/9/2021)
Delete lines 21 - 30 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 1192 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 1192 c1
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor