+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1009 (Ch. 2018-157)
- Substituted HB 1009
- Read 2nd time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 381.7355 - Project requirements; review criteria.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 1184 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 1184 Filed
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 1184 Filed
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor