+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Agriculture read 1st time
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/07/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Agriculture
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Appropriations
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
303254 - Amendment
Delete lines 391 - 404 and insert:
560694 - Amendment
Delete line 287 and insert:
236056 - Amendment
Delete lines 393 - 407 and insert:
940080 - Amendment
Delete lines 539 - 544 and insert:
126492 - Amendment
Between lines 604 and 605 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 213.05 - Department of Revenue; control and administration of revenue laws.
- 213.053 - Confidentiality and information sharing.
- 319.30 - Definitions; dismantling, destruction, change of identity of motor vehicle or mobile home; salvage.
- 538.18 - Definitions.
- 538.19 - Records required; limitation of liability.
- 538.20 - Inspection of regulated metals property and records.
- 538.21 - Hold notice.
- 538.23 - Violations and penalties.
- 538.25 - Registration.
- 538.26 - Certain acts and practices prohibited.
- 538.27 -
- 538.29 -
+ − Votes (2)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1182 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1182 c1
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor