+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
- Substituted HB 15
- Read 3rd time
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/19/13
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by- Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/13, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Criminal Justice
- Favorable by Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/06/13, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
- Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/13, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Criminal Justice
On December 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
203006 - Amendment
Delete lines 15 - 26 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Criminal Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor