+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2016-195
- Approved by Governor
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/HB 795
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16
- Referred to Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
288390 - Amendment
Delete lines 47 - 50 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 373.4144 - Federal environmental permitting.
+ − Votes (5)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1176 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1176 c1
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1176 c1
- Yeas: 15
March 8, 2016: Floor vote: S 1176 c1
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
March 2, 2016: Floor vote: S 1176 c1
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor