+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Criminal Justice
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On December 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 16.81 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor