+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor