+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
791982 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/31/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 403.7032 - Recycling.
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1156 Filed
- Yeas: 6
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1156 c1
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor