+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
202660 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1102 Filed
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor