+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Now in Rules
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
- Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Rules
On December 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
166916 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/12/2020)
Between lines 17 and 18 insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 489.117 - Registration; specialty contractors.
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1102 Filed
- Yeas: 9
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1102 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor