+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 43 (Ch. 2016-50)
- Substituted HB 43
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/26/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On August 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (7)
373518 - Amendment
Between lines 38 and 39 insert:
397570 - Amendment
Delete lines 20 - 30 and insert:
860040 - Amendment
Delete lines 31 - 38 and insert:
437560 - Amendment
Delete lines 33 - 38 and insert:
544768 - Amendment
Between lines 38 and 39 insert:
401070 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (116098)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
116098 - Amendment
Delete lines 20 - 38 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 761.061 -
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 110 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 110 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 110 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor