+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 435 (Ch. 2017-83), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2017-84)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 655.057 - Records; limited restrictions upon public access.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor