+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 501.9745 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1076 Filed
- Yeas: 8
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1076 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor