+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-183
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
- CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (215478)
- Read 2nd time
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
637700 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/23/2021)
Delete lines 236 - 748 and insert:
516430 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/31/2021)
Delete line 379 and insert:
215478 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/21/2021)
Delete lines 862 - 1063 and insert:
880488 - Amendment to Amendment (215478) (Senate: Adopted 4/21/2021)
Between lines 119 and 120 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (42)
- 69.031 - Designated financial institutions for assets in hands of guardians, curators, administrators, trustees, receivers, or other officers.
- 732.507 - Effect of subsequent marriage, birth, adoption, or dissolution of marriage.
- 736.0103 - Definitions.
- 736.0105 - Default and mandatory rules.
- 736.0201 - Role of court in trust proceedings.
- 736.0603 - Settlor’s powers; powers of withdrawal.
- 736.0703 - Cotrustees.
- 736.0802 - Duty of loyalty.
- 736.0808 - Powers to direct.
- 736.08125 - Protection of successor trustees.
- 736.1008 - Limitations on proceedings against trustees.
- 736.1017 - Certification of trust.
- 736.1105 - Dissolution of marriage; effect on revocable trust.
- 736.1109 -
- 736.1401 -
- 736.1403 -
- 736.1405 -
- 736.1406 -
- 736.1407 -
- 736.1408 -
- 736.1409 -
- 736.141 -
- 736.1411 -
- 736.1412 -
- 736.1413 -
- 736.1414 -
- 736.1415 -
- 736.1416 -
- 736.1501 -
- 736.1502 -
- 736.1503 -
- 736.1504 -
- 736.1505 -
- 736.1506 -
- 736.1507 -
- 736.1508 -
- 736.1509 -
- 736.151 -
- 736.1511 -
- 736.1512 -
- 738.104 - Trustee’s power to adjust.
- 744.3679 - Simplified accounting procedures in certain cases.
+ − Votes (5)
November 10, 2021: Floor vote: S 1070 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 10, 2021: Floor vote: S 1070 c1
- Yeas: 9
November 10, 2021: Floor vote: S 1070 c2
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 1070 e1
- Yeas: 117
April 21, 2021: Floor vote: S 1070 c2
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor