+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
833352 - Amendment
Between lines 305 and 306 insert:
109356 - Amendment
Delete lines 339 - 342 and insert:
389028 - Amendment
Between lines 380 and 381 insert:
925088 - Amendment
Between lines 76 and 77 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1068 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1068 c1
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor