+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/28/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/20/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
678212 - Amendment
Delete lines 168 - 197 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 446.021 - Definitions of terms used in ss. 446.011-446.092.
- 446.032 - General duties of the department for apprenticeship training.
- 446.045 - State Apprenticeship Advisory Council.
- 446.081 - Limitation.
- 446.091 - On-the-job training program.
- 446.092 - Criteria for apprenticeship occupations.
- 1008.44 - CAPE Industry Certification Funding List and CAPE Postsecondary Industry Certification Funding List.
- 1009.42 - Financial aid appeal process.
- 1003.4295 - Acceleration options.
- 1004.015 - Higher Education Coordinating Council.
- 1004.92 - Purpose and responsibilities for career education.
- 1004.93 - Adult general education.
- 1007.273 - Collegiate high school program.
- 1011.80 - Funds for operation of workforce education programs.
- 1011.802 -
- 1011.803 -
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1060 Filed
- Yeas: 11
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1060 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1060 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor