+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/22/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
875578 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/22/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 376.91 -
+ − Vote
May 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 1054 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor