+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
802848 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 553.80 - Enforcement.
+ − Vote
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 1036 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor