+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 741 (Vetoed by Governor)
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
- Introduced
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (8)
611262 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/12/2022)
Before line 18 insert:
922272 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/9/2022)
Delete lines 87 - 103 and insert:
384970 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 3/2/2022)
Delete lines 44 - 126 and insert:
655702 - Substitute Amendment (384970) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/2/2022)
Delete lines 44 - 126 and insert:
354274 - Amendment (Senate: Not Considered 3/4/2022)
Delete lines 30 - 173 and insert:
634476 - Amendment (Senate: Not Considered 3/4/2022)
Delete lines 30 - 110 and insert:
493938 - Amendment (Senate: Not Considered 3/4/2022)
Delete line 113 and insert:
704420 - Amendment (Senate: Not Considered 3/4/2022)
Between lines 173 and 174 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1024 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1024 c1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1024 c2
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor