+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2019-132
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (024859)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
- Amendment(s) adopted (119005, 751155)
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (250377)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
- Referred to Calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (925196)
- Ordered engrossed
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Agriculture read 1st time
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
- Original reference(s) removed: Rules
- Now in Appropriations
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Agriculture
- Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Agriculture; Rules
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (8)
024859 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
119005 - Amendment to Amendment (250377)
Remove lines 36-66 and insert:
751155 - Amendment to Amendment (250377)
Remove lines 238-254 and insert:
250377 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
369856 - Amendment to Amendment (925196)
Delete line 83 and insert:
925196 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
151590 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
867164 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (7)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 c1
- Yeas: 19
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 Filed
- Yeas: 10
May 3, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 e1
- Yeas: 39
May 1, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 e1 - Amendment 751155
- Yeas: 112
May 1, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 e1
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 1
April 25, 2019: Floor vote: S 1020 e1
- Yeas: 36