+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
902328 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/8/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Vote
June 14, 2022: Floor vote: S 1018 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor