+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Health Policy
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 381.029 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor