+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 609 (Ch. 2014-52)
- Substituted CS/HB 609
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 6 NAYS 5
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
153888 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
+ − Votes (3)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1008 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1008 Filed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1008 c1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor