+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article XI - Section 2
- Article XI - Section 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor