+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- Article VIII - Section 6