+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1184 (Adopted)
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor