+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1563 (Ch. 2022-219)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
- In Messages
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/22
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 4
- Received
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- In Messages
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- CS Filed
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- CS Filed
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Ways & Means Committee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to Ways & Means Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
321363 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/31/2022)
Remove lines 141-156 and insert:
+ − Votes (3)
August 18, 2022: Floor vote: H 1 c2
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 4
March 10, 2022: Floor vote: H 1 c2
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2022: Floor vote: H 1 c2
- Yeas: 115
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor