+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Rules
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- CS adopted
- Read 2nd time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
826439 - Amendment
Remove lines 17-18 and insert:
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor