+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 195 (Ch. 2016-118)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
- Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/SJR 170
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (774531)
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/21/16, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily postponed
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 12/01/15, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Finance and Tax Committee
- Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
774531 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the resolving clause and insert:
458303 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the resolving clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Article VII - Section 3
- Article VII - Section 4
- Article XII - Section 34
- Article XII -
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2016: Floor vote: H 193 e1
- Yeas: 117
March 9, 2016: Floor vote: H 193 e1
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor