+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/18/13, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 1006.07 - District school board duties relating to student discipline and school safety.