+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-166, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2014-224)
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (137914, 322822, 965520)
- In returning messages
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (137914)
- Reconsidered
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (322822, 965520)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
- Substituted for CS/SB 744
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Received
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/10/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
- CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/08/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 11:30 am, 12 HOB
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
965520 - Amendment
Delete lines 13 - 50 and insert:
322822 - Amendment
Before line 13 insert:
701892 - Amendment
Between lines 49 and 50 insert:
137914 - Amendment
Between lines 49 and 50 insert:
697271 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 0977 c1
- Yeas: 115
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 0977 c1
- Yeas: 39
April 23, 2014: Floor vote: H 0977 c1
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor