+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in State Affairs Committee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
- Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Ways & Means Committee
- Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Ways & Means Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On December 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor