+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/10/16, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Ports Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor