+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2022-129
- Approved by Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- In Messages
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 5
- Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (922297)
- In returning messages
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 84, NAYS 35
- Concurred in Senate amendment 541410 as amended
- Amendment 922297 adopted
- Amendment 153643 Failed
- Added to Senate Message List
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 8
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (541410)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 190
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 75, NAYS 38
- Read 3rd time
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On October 25, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On September 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (10)
937493 - Amendment (Adopted 10/21/2021)
Remove lines 68-72 and insert:
519389 - Amendment (Failed to Adopt 1/13/2022)
Remove lines 18-89 and insert:
119499 - Amendment (Withdrawn 12/1/2021)
Between lines 69 and 70, insert:
576340 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/3/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
777888 - Amendment to Amendment (576340) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/3/2022)
Between lines 99 and 100 insert:
466778 - Amendment to Amendment (576340) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/3/2022)
Between lines 99 and 100 insert:
117010 - Amendment to Amendment (576340) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/3/2022)
Delete lines 100 - 292 and insert:
541410 - Amendment (Delete All) (House: Concurred as Amended 3/11/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
922297 - Amendment to Amendment (541410) (Senate: Concurred 3/11/2022)
Remove lines 96-314 of the amendment and insert:
153643 - Amendment to Amendment (922297) (House: Failed 3/11/2022)
Between lines 185 and 186 of the amendment, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2022: Floor vote: H 95 c1
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 35
March 11, 2022: Floor vote: H 95 c1
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 5
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: H 95 c1
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
February 24, 2022: Floor vote: H 95 c1
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor