+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2014-240)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 1
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/14
- Received
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
932017 - Amendment
Remove lines 36-40 and insert:
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2014: Floor vote: H 0949 c1
- Yeas: 40
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 0949 c1
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor