+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor