+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-154
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (366320)
- In returning messages
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/SB 1136
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (366320)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Introduced
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
366320 - Amendment
Delete line 99 and insert:
657225 - Amendment
Remove line 69 and insert:
337451 - Amendment
Remove lines 87-92 and insert:
344723 - Amendment
Remove lines 75-83 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 631.401 - Recovery of assessments and assumed policy obligations.
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0927 c1
- Yeas: 107
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0927 c1
- Yeas: 38
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 0927 c1
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor