+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2022-56
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 80, NAYS 40
- Amendment 721266 Concur
- Amendment 892588 Concur
- Added to Senate Message List
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 16
- Read 3rd time
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) adopted (721266, 892588)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1352
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 39
- Read 3rd time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On February 5, 2022 in the House:
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Public Integrity & Elections Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (8)
423655 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
892588 - Amendment (House: Concur 3/10/2022)
Delete lines 26 - 35 and insert:
889914 - Amendment (Senate: Replaced by Substitute Amendment 3/4/2022)
Between lines 77 and 78 insert:
477848 - Substitute Amendment (889914) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/4/2022)
Between lines 77 and 78 insert:
562592 - Amendment to Substitute Amendment (477848) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/4/2022)
Delete line 24 and insert:
137756 - Amendment to Substitute Amendment (477848) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/4/2022)
Delete lines 24 - 25 and insert:
721266 - Substitute Amendment (889914) (House: Concur 3/10/2022)
Between lines 77 and 78 insert:
887733 - Amendment to Amendment (721266)
Remove lines 17-19 of the amendment and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2022: Floor vote: H 921 c2
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 40
March 7, 2022: Floor vote: H 921 c2
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 16
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: H 921 c2 - Amendment 137756
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
March 2, 2022: Floor vote: H 921 c2
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 39