+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2021-150
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
- In Messages
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
- Read 3rd time
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 34
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Rules
- Received
- Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1128
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment 033655 withdrawn
- Amendment 048391 withdrawn
- Amendment 875969 Failed
- Amendment 528267 Failed
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment 048391 filed
- Amendment 033655 filed
- Amendment 875969 filed
- Amendment 528267 filed
On April 18, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/21/2021)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Commerce Committee
- Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Commerce Committee agenda
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Original reference removed: Ways & Means Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Ways & Means Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (8)
534993 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/11/2021)
Remove lines 17-37 and insert:
230255 - Amendment (Failed to Adopt 4/14/2021)
Remove lines 21-22 and insert:
306187 - Amendment (Adopted 4/14/2021)
Remove line 24 and insert:
682085 - Amendment (Adopted 4/14/2021)
Between lines 36 and 37, insert:
033655 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 4/21/2021)
Between lines 14 and 15, insert:
048391 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 4/21/2021)
Between lines 14 and 15, insert:
528267 - Amendment (House: Failed 4/21/2021)
Remove lines 21-22 and insert:
875969 - Amendment (House: Failed 4/21/2021)
Remove lines 44-47 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 366.032 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2021: Floor vote: H 919 c2
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
April 22, 2021: Floor vote: H 919 c2
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 34