+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/23/20, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On January 3, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor