+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Commerce Committee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
170303 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor