+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Commerce Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 364 (Ch. 2022-189)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On December 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 320.08053 - Establishment of specialty license plates.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor